WA SB5212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of dogs and cats used for science or research purposes.
Title
Concerning the adoption of dogs and cats used for science or research purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 184, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 0. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-28 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |