WA SB5210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Notifying purchasers of hearing instruments about uses and benefits of telecoil and bluetooth technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notifying purchasers of hearing instruments about uses and benefits of telecoil and bluetooth technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-29SenateChapter 183, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-29SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-03HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-27HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-06SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1078 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5210&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5210.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5210.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5210.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5210.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117615&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5210&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117615&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5210&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117615&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5210&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback