WA HB1078 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Notifying purchasers of hearing instruments about uses and benefits of telecoil and bluetooth technology.
Title
Notifying purchasers of hearing instruments about uses and benefits of telecoil and bluetooth technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5210 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1078&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1078.pdf |