WA SB5203 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the state's response to climate change by updating the state's planning framework.
Title
Improving the state's response to climate change by updating the state's planning framework.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1181 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 070 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
86 | 12 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |