WA HB1181 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the state's response to climate change by updating the state's planning framework.
Title
Improving the state's response to climate change by updating the state's planning framework.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-03 | House | Chapter 228, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
2023-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-03 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-01-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-25 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5203 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 070 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
86 | 12 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |