WA SB5203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing youth courts to have jurisdiction over transit infractions.
Title
Allowing youth courts to have jurisdiction over transit infractions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2017.