WA SB5196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Describing how the legislature may convene a special session.
Title
Describing how the legislature may convene a special session.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 150, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |