WA SB5151 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the growth management hearings board to topically index the rulings, decisions, and orders it publishes.
Title
Requiring the growth management hearings board to topically index the rulings, decisions, and orders it publishes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 452, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-21 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |