WA SB5137 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending workers' compensation cost-of-living adjustments for fiscal year 2022, changing the basis of certain future adjustments to the consumer price index, and capping the rate of increase for future adjustments.
Title
Suspending workers' compensation cost-of-living adjustments for fiscal year 2022, changing the basis of certain future adjustments to the consumer price index, and capping the rate of increase for future adjustments.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 08 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 32 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 32 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 32 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |