WA SB5134 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reentry services and supports.
Title
Concerning reentry services and supports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass without amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass without amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 467, 2023 Laws PV. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-19 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2023-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-27 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
72 | 02 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 09 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |