WA SB5112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the efficient administration of campaign finance and public disclosure reporting and enforcement.
Title
Concerning the efficient administration of campaign finance and public disclosure reporting and enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1195 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/21/2019*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5112&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5112.pdf |