WA SB5106 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a civil action for webcam unauthorized remote access.
Title
Creating a civil action for webcam unauthorized remote access.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-04-24 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2015-04-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |