WA SB5090 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing worker protections.
Title
Increasing worker protections.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1097 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-11 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 17 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5090&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5090.pdf |