WA SB5083 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the display of political yard signs in homeowners' associations.
Title
Concerning the display of political yard signs in homeowners' associations.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-02 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-02 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; do pass. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |