WA SB5072 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the government issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth.
Title
Concerning the government issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1031 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-16 - Chapter 55, 2021 Laws.
Subjects
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5072&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5072.pdf |