WA HB1031 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 55, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 55, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the government issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth.
Title
Concerning the government issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 55, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-01-14 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-12-17 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5072 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.