WA SB5059 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prejudgment interest.
Title
Concerning prejudgment interest.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Yasmin Trudeau [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Executive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM failed. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 56 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 56 | 111 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |