WA SB5059 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the patent troll prevention act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the patent troll prevention act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-25SenateEffective date 7/24/2015.
2015-04-25SenateChapter 108, 2015 Laws.
2015-04-25SenateGovernor signed.
2015-04-20SenateDelivered to Governor.
2015-04-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-04-14SenatePresident signed.
2015-04-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2015-04-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-04-09HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-03-31HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2015-03-26HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass.
2015-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2015-03-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2015-02-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2015-02-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2015-02-24SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-02-24Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2015-02-10SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2015-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-02-05SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2015-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2015-01-09SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1092 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback