WA HB1092 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the patent troll prevention act.
Title
Creating the patent troll prevention act.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-04 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5059 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.