WA SB5052 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the cannabis patient protection act.
Title
Establishing the cannabis patient protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015*. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Chapter 70, 2015 Laws PV. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-13 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-13 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |