WA SB5040 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing litter control along state highways.
Title
Enhancing litter control along state highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 231, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-25 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | 200 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 200 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |