WA SB5038 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the open carry of certain weapons at public demonstrations and the state capitol.
Title
Prohibiting the open carry of certain weapons at public demonstrations and the state capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 5/12/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 261, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-03-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-03-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 41 | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |