WA SB5037 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying organized retail theft provisions.
Title
Modifying organized retail theft provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-26 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |