WA SB5033 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sexually violent predators.
Title
Concerning sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing . |
2015-01-15 | Senate | And refer to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing . |
2015-01-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; without recommendation. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1059 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5033&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5033.pdf |