WA HB1059 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sexually violent predators.
Title
Concerning sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015*. |
2015-05-18 | House | Chapter 278, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 87; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-06 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2014-12-30 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5033 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.