WA SB5026 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding provisions relating to the collection of biological samples for DNA identification analysis.
Title
Expanding provisions relating to the collection of biological samples for DNA identification analysis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-03-24 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-23 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-30 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |