WA SB5011 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale or distribution of certain novelty lighters.
Title
Prohibiting the sale or distribution of certain novelty lighters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-29 | Chapter 273, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-29 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-04-18 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | CL - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-25 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-03-03 | Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1015 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.