WA HJM4016 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting to commence proceedings in naming state route number 902 the Gold Star Memorial Highway.
Title
Requesting to commence proceedings in naming state route number 902 the Gold Star Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |