WA HJM4001 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that Congress allow states to adopt year-round daylight savings time.
Title
Requesting that Congress allow states to adopt year-round daylight savings time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |