WA HB3046 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the dissolution of the assets and affairs of a nonprofit corporation.
Title
Addressing the dissolution of the assets and affairs of a nonprofit corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. John Driscoll [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 3/25/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 212, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6788 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.