WA HB3016 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating provisions concerning the modification, review, and adjustment of child support orders to improve access to justice and to ensure compliance with federal requirements.
Title
Updating provisions concerning the modification, review, and adjustment of child support orders to improve access to justice and to ensure compliance with federal requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 279, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6640 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.