WA HB2983 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington global health technologies and product development competitiveness program and allowing certain tax credits for program contributions.
Title
Creating the Washington global health technologies and product development competitiveness program and allowing certain tax credits for program contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Finance. | |
2010-02-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-01 | CEDT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6675 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-05 - Effective date 7/13/2010.