CA AB1862 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 6738 and 8729 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 8, 174.5, 5063.5, 12242.5, and 16403 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 16101, 16956, and 16959 of, the Corporations Code, relating to limited liability partnerships.
Title
Engineering, land surveying, and architecture: limited liability partnerships.
Sponsors
Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6738 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8729 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 12242.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16956 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16959 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 174.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5063.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |