WA SB6675 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington global health technologies and product development competitiveness program and allowing certain tax credits for program contributions.
Title
Creating the Washington global health technologies and product development competitiveness program and allowing certain tax credits for program contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-04-05 | Chapter 13, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-04-05 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-30 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-29 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-29 | President signed. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-22 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-18 | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-18 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-03-16 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-03-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-04 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-04 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2983 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.