WA HB2962 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing county treasurers to use electronic bill presentment and payment that includes an automatic electronic payment option for property taxes.
Title
Allowing county treasurers to use electronic bill presentment and payment that includes an automatic electronic payment option for property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 200, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-23 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |