WA HB2961 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning election year restrictions on email updates from state legislators.
Title
Concerning election year restrictions on email updates from state legislators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-02 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |