WA HB2871 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the baseball stadium based special license plate.
Title
Changing the baseball stadium based special license plate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB6489 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2871&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2871.pdf |