WA HB2852 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning college-level online learning by high school students.
Title
Concerning college-level online learning by high school students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | APPE - Majority; do pass ED 10 bill proposed by Education. | |
2010-02-04 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Education Appropriations. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Education. |