WA HB2830 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 3/17/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing credit union regulatory enforcement powers.
Title
Addressing credit union regulatory enforcement powers.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 3/17/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 87, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-26 | FII - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6369 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.