WA HB2819 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designating pumped storage projects located in a county bordering the Columbia river utilizing statutorily authorized water rights to be projects of statewide significance.
Title
Designating pumped storage projects located in a county bordering the Columbia river utilizing statutorily authorized water rights to be projects of statewide significance.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 46, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6578 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.