WA HB2789 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Collecting information regarding police use of deadly force.
Title
Collecting information regarding police use of deadly force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6527 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.