WA SB6527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Collecting information regarding police use of deadly force.
Title
Collecting information regarding police use of deadly force.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2789 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.