WA HB2759 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain requirements for ferry vessel construction.
Title
Modifying certain requirements for ferry vessel construction.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |