WA HB2723 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing off-road vehicle and snowmobile registration enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing off-road vehicle and snowmobile registration enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-19HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-19HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-19House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2723&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2723.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2723-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2723-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2723-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121726&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-19-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2723&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121726&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2723&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback