WA HB2718 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning railroad crews.
Title
Concerning railroad crews.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | LWD - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2718&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2718.pdf |