WA HB2701 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the time of commencement of regular legislative sessions.
Title
Clarifying the time of commencement of regular legislative sessions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-18 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-02 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2701&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2701.pdf |