WA HB2696 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 4/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 4/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medical certificate requirements for applicants and holders of commercial drivers' licenses and commercial learners' permits.
Title
Concerning medical certificate requirements for applicants and holders of commercial drivers' licenses and commercial learners' permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Effective date 4/30/2019. |
2018-03-13 | House | Chapter 49, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-31 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB6330 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.