WA HB2673 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recoverable costs from the recording of certain judgment liens.
Title
Concerning recoverable costs from the recording of certain judgment liens.
Sponsors
Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2673&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2673.pdf |