WA HB2670 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the school district levy base.
Title
Restoring the school district levy base.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-19 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-19 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-19 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-21 | APPE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Education Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6502 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.