WA HB2662 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing limited retail telecommunications services for public utility districts that provide only sewer, water, and telecommunications on the effective date of this act.
Title
Authorizing limited retail telecommunications services for public utility districts that provide only sewer, water, and telecommunications on the effective date of this act.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] |
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB6034 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2662&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2662.pdf |